SD SB41 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-27 - Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 142
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-27 - Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 142
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specify the criminal penalty for providing care for more than twelve children in an unregistered family day care.
Title
Specify the criminal penalty for providing care for more than twelve children in an unregistered family day care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-27 | Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 142 | |
2010-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-20 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-01-20 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-15 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-01-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 21 |