SD SB45 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Signed by Governor S.J. 608
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Signed by Governor S.J. 608
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the state trunk highway system in Codington County.
Title
Revise the state trunk highway system in Codington County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Signed by Governor S.J. 608 | |
2010-03-04 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 566 | |
2010-03-03 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 688 | |
2010-03-02 | Signed by President S.J. 532 | |
2010-03-01 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 637 | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 613 | |
2010-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-10 | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 350 | |
2010-02-09 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 261 | |
2010-02-04 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 250 | |
2010-02-03 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-03 | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 220 | |
2010-02-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 22 |