SD SB50 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize allocation and reallocation of volume, issuance authority, and other benefits in order to facilitate the issuance of bonds and compliance with certain federal requirements and to declare an emergency.
Title
Authorize allocation and reallocation of volume, issuance authority, and other benefits in order to facilitate the issuance of bonds and compliance with certain federal requirements and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Signed by Governor S.J. 654 | |
2010-03-09 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 608 | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 755 | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by President S.J. 573 | |
2010-03-03 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 681 | |
2010-03-02 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 663 | |
2010-03-01 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 623 | |
2010-03-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-17 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 447 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 337 | |
2010-02-12 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 317 | |
2010-02-12 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 23 |