SD SB50 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2016 S.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2016 S.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the allocation of certain fees collected by the Department of Corrections.
Title
Revise the allocation of certain fees collected by the Department of Corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2016 S.J. 596 |
2016-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2016 S.J. 560 |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 807 |
2016-03-03 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 534 |
2016-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 764 |
2016-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 743 |
2016-02-29 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 723 |
2016-02-25 | House | First read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 699 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 7. S.J. 435 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 2. S.J. 409 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 127 |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 115 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 83 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 50ra |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 24 |
Subjects
Fees
Penal Institutions, Probation and Parole
Public Fiscal Administration
State Affairs and Government
Penal Institutions, Probation and Parole
Public Fiscal Administration
State Affairs and Government