SD SB55 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2016 S.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2016 S.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to the HOPE probation program.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to the HOPE probation program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2016 S.J. 596 |
2016-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2016 S.J. 560 |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 807 |
2016-03-03 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 534 |
2016-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 3. H.J. 759 |
2016-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 743 |
2016-02-29 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 723 |
2016-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 706 |
2016-02-24 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 657 |
2016-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-21 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 135 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 88 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 56 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 46 |