SD SB6 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require that the unobligated cash balance of the building South Dakota fund be used in determining the allocation of unobligated general funds.
Title
Require that the unobligated cash balance of the building South Dakota fund be used in determining the allocation of unobligated general funds.
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Terri Haverly [R] | Rep. David Lust [R] | Rep. Roger Chase [R] |
Sen. Kyle Schoenfish [R] | Rep. Jamie Smith [D] | Rep. Charles Turbiville [R] | Sen. Susan Wismer [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 459 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 269 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 197 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 117 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 13 |