SD SB60 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 714
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 714
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide newborn screening of inherited and genetic disorders.
Title
Provide newborn screening of inherited and genetic disorders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 714 |
2015-03-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 689 |
2015-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 730 |
2015-03-10 | House | Signed by President S.J. 658 |
2015-03-09 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 636 |
2015-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 16. H.J. 599 |
2015-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 599 Amendment 60fa |
2015-02-26 | House | Fiscal Note Requested, Passed H.J. 538 |
2015-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 529 |
2015-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 503 |
2015-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 471 |
2015-02-19 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 450 |
2015-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-12 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2015-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-05 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2015-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 229 |
2015-01-28 | House | First read in House H.J. 205 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 4. S.J. 195 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 195 Amendment 60jb |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 177 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 100 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-13 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 27 |