SD SB61 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require an electric utility to file rates for purchases of electricity produced by small renewable power facilities.
Title
Require an electric utility to file rates for purchases of electricity produced by small renewable power facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Signed by Governor S.J. 654 | |
2010-03-08 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 585 | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 711 | |
2010-03-03 | Signed by President S.J. 558 | |
2010-03-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 653 | |
2010-03-01 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 643 | |
2010-02-25 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 618 | |
2010-02-24 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 599 | |
2010-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-22 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 163 | |
2010-01-21 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 113 | |
2010-01-20 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-01-20 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 88 | |
2010-01-20 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 25 |