SD SB61 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize board members of sanitary districts to contract with the districts in limited cases.
Title
Authorize board members of sanitary districts to contract with the districts in limited cases.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] | Rep. Melissa Magstadt [R] | Rep. Scott Munsterman [R] | Sen. Thomas Nelson [R] |
Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] | Rep. Charles Turbiville [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Signed by Governor S.J. 644 | |
2011-03-01 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 568 | |
2011-02-28 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 563 | |
2011-02-25 | Signed by President S.J. 542 | |
2011-02-24 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 5. H.J. 524 | |
2011-02-23 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 504 | |
2011-02-22 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 483 | |
2011-02-17 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 439 | |
2011-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-01 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 247 | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 250 | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 229 | |
2011-01-26 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 208 | |
2011-01-26 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-21 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 162 |