SD SB61 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding a municipal office nominating petition.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding a municipal office nominating petition.
Sponsors
Sen. Helene Duhamel [R] | Sen. Jeff Partridge [R] | Sen. Lee Schoenbeck [R] | Sen. Deb Soholt [R] |
Rep. Kirk Chaffee [R] | Sen. Michael Diedrich [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2020 S.J. 558 |
2020-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2020 S.J. 474 |
2020-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 535 |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 445 |
2020-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 469 |
2020-03-03 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-03-03 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred to House Local Government H.J. 410 |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading House H.J. 229 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 160 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 56 |