SD SB61 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Signed by the Governor on February 28, 2023 S.J. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Signed by the Governor on February 28, 2023 S.J. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise driver's license suspensions for restricted permit holders over the age of sixteen.
Title
Revise driver's license suspensions for restricted permit holders over the age of sixteen.
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Reimer [R] | Sen. John Wiik [R] | Rep. Rocky Blare [R] | Sen. Jessica Castleberry [R] |
Rep. Eric Emery [D] | Sen. Joshua Klumb [R] | Sen. Liz Larson [D] | Rep. William Shorma [R] |
Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - House - Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 28, 2023 S.J. 364 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 21, 2023 S.J. 300 |
2023-02-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 326 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 278 |
2023-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 298 |
2023-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 287 |
2023-02-09 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2023-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 181 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 137 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 128 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent S.J. 7 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 7 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 55 |