SD SB65 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 683
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 683
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the time frame for the design of a new motor license plate series and the issuance of a new motor license plate design series and to transfer funds from the license plate special revenue fund to the prison industries revolving fund.
Title
Revise the time frame for the design of a new motor license plate series and the issuance of a new motor license plate design series and to transfer funds from the license plate special revenue fund to the prison industries revolving fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor S.J. 683 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by President S.J. 644 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 817 | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 639 | |
2010-03-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 17. H.J. 787 | |
2010-03-03 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. H.J. 738 | |
2010-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-23 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 568 | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 415 | |
2010-02-19 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 389 | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 367 | |
2010-02-17 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 345 | |
2010-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-12 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-19 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 80 |