SD SB65 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Senate Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 18. S.J. 454
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for the construction, renovation, improvement, remodeling, alteration, addition to and repairing of courthouses, jails, incarceration reduction facilities, and other necessary buildings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for the construction, renovation, improvement, remodeling, alteration, addition to and repairing of courthouses, jails, incarceration reduction facilities, and other necessary buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Reconsidered (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenateSenate Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 18. S.J. 454
2019-02-20SenateIntent to reconsider S.J. 433
2019-02-20SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 15, NAYS 19. S.J. 432
2019-02-13SenateLocal Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 378
2019-02-13SenateLocal Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 65ka
2019-02-13SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 140

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback