SD SB68 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 S.J. 793
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 S.J. 793
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the assistance provided to counties by state firefighting resources.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the assistance provided to counties by state firefighting resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 S.J. 793 |
2018-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2018 S.J. 776 |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 760 |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 749 |
2018-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 706 |
2018-03-05 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-03-05 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 676 |
2018-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 181 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 202 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 167 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 65 |