SD SB7 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2017 S.J. 692
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2017 S.J. 692
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the criteria for determining if property is classified as agricultural land for property tax purposes.
Title
Revise the criteria for determining if property is classified as agricultural land for property tax purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Cammack [R] | Sen. Jason Frerichs [D] | Rep. Larry Tidemann [R] | Rep. Lee Qualm [R] |
Rep. Julie Bartling [D] | Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. Larry Rhoden [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2017 S.J. 692 |
2017-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2017 S.J. 654 |
2017-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 675 |
2017-03-01 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 608 |
2017-02-28 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 571 |
2017-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 554 |
2017-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 539 |
2017-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 521 |
2017-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 477 |
2017-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 438 |
2017-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 421 |
2017-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 410 |
2017-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 393 |
2017-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 378 |
2017-02-09 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 1. H.J. 357 |
2017-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 194 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 5. S.J. 187 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 160 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-10 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 16 |