SD SB70 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-6)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding hospital liens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding hospital liens.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 13, 2019
2019-03-07HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 07, 2019 S.J. 642
2019-03-06HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 670
2019-03-05HouseSigned by the President S.J. 618
2019-03-04HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 589
2019-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 569
2019-02-25HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-25HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 516
2019-02-25HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 70wa
2019-02-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-13HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 392
2019-02-12SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 351
2019-02-08SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-08SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 310
2019-02-08SenateHealth and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 70ba
2019-02-08SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-23SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 155

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=70&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB70P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB70SHE.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB70HJU.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB70ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28003&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28165&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28768&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28960&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29102&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback