SD SB73 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2016 S.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2016 S.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify certain provisions regarding open meetings.
Title
Clarify certain provisions regarding open meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2016 S.J. 596 |
2016-03-03 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 03, 2016 S.J. 516 |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 767 |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 496 |
2016-02-29 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 4. H.J. 723 |
2016-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 706 |
2016-02-24 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 656 |
2016-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 344 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 252 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 229 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 117 |