SD SB80 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reinstate certain provisions repealed in the Eighty-seventh Legislative Session regarding the accounting for federal impact aid.
Title
Reinstate certain provisions repealed in the Eighty-seventh Legislative Session regarding the accounting for federal impact aid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 756 |
2013-03-06 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 694 |
2013-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 742 |
2013-03-04 | House | Signed by President S.J. 655 |
2013-02-28 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 625 |
2013-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 547 |
2013-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 535 |
2013-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 507 |
2013-02-20 | House | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 448 |
2013-02-20 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 80ra |
2013-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-05 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 304 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 307 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 287 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 130 |