SD SB84 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow for the reimbursement of travel expenses during the recruitment of certain professional staff.
Title
Allow for the reimbursement of travel expenses during the recruitment of certain professional staff.
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Sen. Bob Gray [R] | Rep. Jon Hansen [R] | Rep. Charles Hoffman [R] |
Sen. Daniel Lederman [R] | Rep. Scott Munsterman [R] | Sen. Russell Olson [R] | Rep. Tad Perry [R] |
Rep. Larry Tidemann [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor S.J. 654 | |
2012-02-27 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 572 | |
2012-02-24 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 615 | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by President S.J. 548 | |
2012-02-22 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 10. H.J. 552 | |
2012-02-21 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 518 | |
2012-02-21 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-13 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 431 | |
2012-02-10 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 372 | |
2012-02-08 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 330 | |
2012-02-08 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 124 |