SD SB90 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions related to the High School Activities Association.
Title
Revise certain provisions related to the High School Activities Association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 688 |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 773 |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 670 |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by President S.J. 653 |
2014-03-12 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 640 |
2014-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 6. H.J. 705 |
2014-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 705 Amendment 90tf |
2014-03-10 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 691 |
2014-03-10 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 90jc |
2014-03-10 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 90jb |
2014-03-10 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 90ja |
2014-03-10 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2014-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-20 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 470 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 5. S.J. 370 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 322 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 90ma |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate Appropriations, Passed S.J. 149 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 128 |