SD SB91 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding open meeting requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding open meeting requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 21, 2019 S.J. 733
2019-03-11HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 672
2019-03-07HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 701
2019-03-07HouseSigned by the President S.J. 647
2019-03-06HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 666
2019-03-05HouseRemove from Consent Calendar H.J. 632
2019-03-04HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-03-04HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 597
2019-03-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-11HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 355
2019-02-08SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 319
2019-02-06SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-06SenateState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 274
2019-02-06SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 91ja
2019-02-06SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 165

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback