SD SB97 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-4)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2016 S.J. 603
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-4)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2016 S.J. 603
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the automatic removal of all petty offenses, municipal ordinance violations, and Class 2 misdemeanor charges or convictions from background check records after ten years under certain conditions.
Title
Provide for the automatic removal of all petty offenses, municipal ordinance violations, and Class 2 misdemeanor charges or convictions from background check records after ten years under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2016 S.J. 603 |
2016-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2016 S.J. 560 |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 807 |
2016-03-03 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 534 |
2016-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 760 |
2016-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 743 |
2016-02-29 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 723 |
2016-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 706 |
2016-02-24 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 2. H.J. 657 |
2016-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-19 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 468 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 342 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 97yb |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 148 |