SD SB98 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal the sunset of a wine manufacturer license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal the sunset of a wine manufacturer license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Removed from table (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Tabled (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
2019-03-06HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 06, 2019 S.J. 630
2019-03-05HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 647
2019-03-04HouseSigned by the President S.J. 600
2019-02-28HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 589
2019-02-27HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-27HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 565
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-22HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 484
2019-02-21SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 458
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-19SenateCommerce and Energy Title amended, Passed S.J. 397 Amendment 98yta
2019-02-19SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
2019-02-19SenateCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 98ya
2019-02-19SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-12SenateCommerce and Energy Removed from table, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
2019-02-07SenateCommerce and Energy Tabled, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 300
2019-02-07SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 167

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=98&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB98P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB98SCO.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB98ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27926&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28141&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28390&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28600&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28928&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29034&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback