SD SB99 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 41, NAYS 29. H.J. 643
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 41, NAYS 29. H.J. 643
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the provisions that determine the amount of the motor vehicle registration fees that shall be applied based on the age of the vehicles.
Title
Revise the provisions that determine the amount of the motor vehicle registration fees that shall be applied based on the age of the vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Sen. Jim Bradford [D] | Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] |
Rep. Dennis Feickert [D] | Sen. Jason Frerichs [D] | Sen. Art Fryslie [R] | Sen. Tom Hansen [R] |
Rep. Lora Hubbel [R] | Sen. Jim Hundstad [D] | Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] | Rep. Don Kopp [R] |
Sen. Shantel Krebs [R] | Rep. David Lust [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Thomas Nelson [R] |
Rep. Tad Perry [R] | Rep. Larry Rhoden [R] | Rep. Tona Rozum [R] | Rep. Roger Solum [R] |
Rep. Steve Street [D] | Sen. Billie Sutton [D] | Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] | Rep. Charles Turbiville [R] |
Rep. Kim Vanneman [R] | Sen. Mike Vehle [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 41 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 41, NAYS 29. H.J. 643 | |
2011-03-03 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 620 | |
2011-03-02 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 609 | |
2011-03-01 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 584 | |
2011-02-28 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 562 | |
2011-02-24 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 523 | |
2011-02-23 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 504 | |
2011-02-22 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 483 | |
2011-02-17 | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 439 | |
2011-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-14 | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 372 | |
2011-02-10 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 404 | |
2011-02-09 | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 372 | |
2011-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-24 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 176 |