TN HB0001 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Pub. Ch. 507
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Sports Gaming Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 14; Title 38; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 5; Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 49 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Sports Gaming Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 14; Title 38; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 5; Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 49 and Title 67.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 2,3, & 4 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 51 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - HOUSE STATE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04 Pub. Ch. 507
2019-06-04 Effective date(s) 05/24/2019; 07/01/2019
2019-06-04 Returned by Governor without signature.
2019-05-14HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-06HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-30HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. 2,3, & 4 Ayes 51, Nays 40 PNV 3
2019-04-30HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 4/30/19
2019-04-30SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 20, Nays 12
2019-04-30SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 4 - SA0432)
2019-04-30SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0422)
2019-04-30SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0288)
2019-04-30SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0189)
2019-04-30SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-25SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-24HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-24HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 58, Nays 37, PNV 2
2019-04-24HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA0472)
2019-04-24HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 6 - HA0474)
2019-04-24HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 5 - HA0473)
2019-04-24HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 3 - HA0471)
2019-04-24HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0436)
2019-04-24HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0319)
2019-04-22HouseReset on cal. for 4/24/2019
2019-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-16HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-16HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-16HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/16/2019
2019-04-09HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 4/9/2019
2019-04-02HouseAction def. in State Committee to 4/9/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26HouseAction def. in State Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19HouseAction def. in State Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseAction def. in State Committee to 3/19/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-01-22HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2019-01-10HouseRef. to State Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2019-01-09HouseP2C held on desk.
2019-01-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-11-07HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0016 (Crossfiled) 2019-06-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 507

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0001&ga=111
Texthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HB0001.pdf
Texthttp://publications.tnsosfiles.com/acts/111/pub/pc0507.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0319.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0436.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0471.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0472.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0473.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0474.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/HB0001.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM1287.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM1405.pdf
Roll Callhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0001&ga=111

Bill Comments

feedback