TN HB0002 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to last calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to last calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends limited sales tax refund for certain appliances, furniture, and building supplies purchased in response to May 2010 flood. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-396.
Title
As introduced, extends limited sales tax refund for certain appliances, furniture, and building supplies purchased in response to May 2010 flood. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-396.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Odom [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GENERAL SUB OF FINANCE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GENERAL SUB OF FINANCE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to last calendar | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-08 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 3/22/2011 | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/8/2011 | |
2011-03-02 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Placed on s/c cal General Sub of Finance for 3/2/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | Action Def. in s/c General Sub of Finance to 3/2/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Placed on s/c cal General Sub of Finance 1 for 2/23/2011 | |
2011-01-21 | Assigned to General Sub of Finance | |
2011-01-13 | Ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-01-12 | P2C held on desk pending the appointment of standing committees. | |
2011-01-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-11-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0006 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm.