TN HB0002 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 485
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "JaJuan Latham Act," which increases the penalty for an aggravated assault or homicide that occurs by a person discharging a firearm from within a motor vehicle and the victim is a minor at the time of the offense. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1 and Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "JaJuan Latham Act," which increases the penalty for an aggravated assault or homicide that occurs by a person discharging a firearm from within a motor vehicle and the victim is a minor at the time of the offense. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1 and Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Pub. Ch. 485
2019-05-29 Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
2019-05-24 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-16HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-14SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-10HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-08HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-05-01SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0
2019-05-01SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-05-01SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-30HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-30HousePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-29HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019
2019-02-20HousePlaced behind the budget
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-02-13HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-06HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 2/13/2019
2019-02-06HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-30HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/6/2019
2019-01-10HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-01-10HouseRef. to Judiciary
2019-01-09HouseP2C held on desk.
2019-01-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-11-07HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0010 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 485

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback