TN HB0030 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 474
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 474
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, limits liability of apiarists under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 44, Chapter 15.
Title
As enacted, limits liability of apiarists under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 44, Chapter 15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Johnson (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-21 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Johnson (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Pub. Ch. 474 | |
2011-06-21 | Effective date(s) 07/01/11 | |
2011-06-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-06-06 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-05-25 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-24 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-24 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-05-21 | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 79, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-21 | H. Placed on Message Calendar #6 for 5/21/2011 | |
2011-05-21 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 25, Nays 2, PNV 1 | |
2011-05-21 | S. adopted am. 1 | |
2011-05-21 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2011-05-05 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2011-05-04 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-05-04 | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 6 | |
2011-04-28 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-28 | Reset on Next Available Regular cal. | |
2011-04-21 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/21/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-02-22 | Meeting Canceled Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to Tort Calendar | |
2011-02-16 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee 1 for 2/22/2011 | |
2011-01-14 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0109 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 474