TN HB0034 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Small Business of COM of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Small Business of COM of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires funeral directors to surrender custody of a dead human body after receiving a written notice and to disclose to the purchaser of a funeral service that it is a violation of the law for a funeral establishment to refuse to surrender the custody of a dead human body to the person legally entitled to custody; removes exemption from continuing education requirements if disciplinary action is taken against a licensee by the board. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, requires funeral directors to surrender custody of a dead human body after receiving a written notice and to disclose to the purchaser of a funeral service that it is a violation of the law for a funeral establishment to refuse to surrender the custody of a dead human body to the person legally entitled to custody; removes exemption from continuing education requirements if disciplinary action is taken against a licensee by the board. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Small Business of COM of Commerce Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Small Business of COM for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Action Def. in s/c Small Business of COM to 3/17/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on s/c cal Small Business of COM for 03/03/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Action Def. in s/c Small Business of COM to 3/3/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on s/c cal Small Business of COM for 02/24/2010 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in s/c Small Business of COM to 2010 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Small Business of COM for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | Action Def. in s/c Small Business of COM to 4/14/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Small Business of COM for 04/07/2009 | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to s/c Small Business of COM | |
2009-02-09 | Ref. to Commerce | |
2009-01-14 | P2C held on desk. | |
2009-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2008-12-22 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1344 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0034&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0034.pdf |