TN HB0054 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-28 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-28 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates Class A misdemeanor offense of owner or employee of intellectual property seizing property alleged to be counterfeit or imitation but permits seizures by law enforcement officers as currently provided by law. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14 and Title 47.
Title
As introduced, creates Class A misdemeanor offense of owner or employee of intellectual property seizing property alleged to be counterfeit or imitation but permits seizures by law enforcement officers as currently provided by law. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14 and Title 47.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | Held on desk. | |
2009-05-26 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/28/09 | |
2009-03-26 | Held on desk. | |
2009-03-26 | Am. no. 1 tabled Ayes 49, Nays 48 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/26/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 03/18/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/11/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-09 | Ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-01-14 | P2C held on desk. | |
2009-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-08 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0070 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0054&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0054.pdf |