TN HB0077 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that any ignition interlock device that is installed on or after January 1, 2024, employ global positioning system (GPS) technology that will geotag the motor vehicle's location whenever an initial startup test, a random retest, or a skipped test occurs, or when circumvention of the device is detected. - Amends TCA Section 55-10-411.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 55-10-411, relative to ignition interlock devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 20 | |
2023-02-13 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/13/2023 |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/9/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/7/2023 |
2023-01-31 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 1/31/2023 |
2023-01-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-01-12 | House | Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-11 | House | P2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees |
2023-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0258 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-23 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2024