TN HB0108 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-25 - Failed In s/c Local Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-25 - Failed In s/c Local Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits a wholesale license to be granted in a municipality that has approved the sale of alcoholic beverages instead of being limited to a municipality having a population of more than 100,000. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-203.
Title
As introduced, permits a wholesale license to be granted in a municipality that has approved the sale of alcoholic beverages instead of being limited to a municipality having a population of more than 100,000. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-203.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-25 | Failed In s/c Local Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Action Def. in s/c Local Government of S&LG to 3/25/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 03/11/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Action Def. in s/c Local Government of S&LG to 3/11/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 03/04/2009 | |
2009-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0490 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-12 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0108&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0108.pdf |