TN HB0145 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the period of reduced fees payable to the secretary of state relating to nonprofit charitable gaming and the solicitation of charitable funds. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 17, Part 1 and Title 48, Chapter 101, Part 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3, Chapter 17, Part 1 and Title 48, Chapter 101, Part 5, relative to charitable organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2023 | |
2023-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 231 | |
2023-04-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-04-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-03-31 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-03-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-03-13 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-03-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/13/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/9/2023 |
2023-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/7/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-02-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/22/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/15/2023 |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2023-01-20 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0170 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 231