TN HB0191 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from six months to 180 days the frequency by which the legislative body of a county or municipality must provide an updated list of modifications or changes to all house, road, or street names or numbers to the local county election commission. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 86.
Title
As introduced, changes from six months to 180 days the frequency by which the legislative body of a county or municipality must provide an updated list of modifications or changes to all house, road, or street names or numbers to the local county election commission. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 86.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Carter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0175 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee