TN HB0222 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from 10 days to 20 days the amount of time a healthcare provider has to furnish a copy of a patient's medical records to the patient or the patient's personal representative following a written request for the records from the patient or the patient's personal representative. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, increases from 10 days to 20 days the amount of time a healthcare provider has to furnish a copy of a patient's medical records to the patient or the patient's personal representative following a written request for the records from the patient or the patient's personal representative. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0039 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee