TN HB0244 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-24 - Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-24 - Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases income eligibility limits for property tax relief for elderly low-income homeowners and disabled homeowners to $36,600; increases income eligibility limits for property tax relief for elderly low-income homeowners under the Property Tax Freeze Act to $36,600; increases the full market value limit on which property tax reimbursement is calculated for eligible elderly low-income homeowners and disabled homeowners to $35,000; and increases the full market value limit on which property tax reimbursement is calculated for disabled veteran and surviving spouse homeowners to $200,000. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 7, relative to property tax relief.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2023-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |