TN HB0268 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires governor to consult with Tennessee Veterinary Medical Association, which under current law may recommend licensed doctors of veterinary medicine and licensed veterinary technicians for appointment to the board, prior to making appointments to board of veterinary medical examiners. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Section 63-12-104.
Title
As introduced, requires governor to consult with Tennessee Veterinary Medical Association, which under current law may recommend licensed doctors of veterinary medicine and licensed veterinary technicians for appointment to the board, prior to making appointments to board of veterinary medical examiners. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Section 63-12-104.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Cobb [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-03 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0151 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-04 - Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0268&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0268.pdf |