TN HB0314 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions relating to the licensing of certain non-depository financial institutions. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 13; Title 45, Chapter 15; Title 45, Chapter 18; Title 45, Chapter 5 and Title 56, Chapter 37.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions relating to the licensing of certain non-depository financial institutions. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 13; Title 45, Chapter 15; Title 45, Chapter 18; Title 45, Chapter 5 and Title 56, Chapter 37.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 122 | |
2017-03-30 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-03-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/30/2017 |
2017-03-27 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2017-03-23 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/23/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2017-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2017-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1202 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 122