TN HB0334 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes certain limitations placed on a person trying to meet the educational requirement for licensure as a polysomnographic technologist by presenting proof of successful completion of an accredited sleep technologist educational program (A-STEP) that is accredited by the American Academy of Sleep Medicine. - Amends TCA Title 63.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 63, relative to polysomnography.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Hurt [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-04-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-03 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-01 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 91, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0334 |
2024-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0821) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-04-04 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-04-03 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 4 |
2023-03-30 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/3/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2023-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2023-01-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0468 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-25 - Companion House Bill substituted