TN HB0352 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes an unfair or deceptive act or practice certain legal advertisements for claims related to medical devices and pharmaceuticals, and the unauthorized use or distribution of protected health information; creates penalties for violations; authorizes attorney general to enforce the provisions of the act. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 23 and Title 47, Chapter 18.
Title
As enacted, makes an unfair or deceptive act or practice certain legal advertisements for claims related to medical devices and pharmaceuticals, and the unauthorized use or distribution of protected health information; creates penalties for violations; authorizes attorney general to enforce the provisions of the act. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 23 and Title 47, Chapter 18.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 119 | |
2019-03-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/11/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer Subcommittee |
2019-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0352 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 119