TN HB0357 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the state board of education from adopting standards or competencies for social and emotional learning; prohibits the department of education from providing instruction or competencies in social and emotional learning to fulfill the requirements for character education. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2; Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Section 49-6-1007.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the state board of education from adopting standards or competencies for social and emotional learning; prohibits the department of education from providing instruction or competencies in social and emotional learning to fulfill the requirements for character education. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2; Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Section 49-6-1007.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Dunn [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2017-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0004 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee