TN HB0448 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires governmental entities to provide a period of public comment for public meetings; authorizes the governmental entities to place reasonable restrictions on the period for public comment. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 44, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 44, Part 1, relative to public meetings.
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Davis [R] | Rep. Monty Fritts [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. William Slater [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY DAVIS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY DAVIS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2023 | |
2023-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 300 | |
2023-04-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-04-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-10 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0402) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-03-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-03-23 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 82, Nays 6, PNV 0 |
2023-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-23 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0222) |
2023-03-23 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0069) |
2023-03-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-16 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/9/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/14/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0551 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 300