TN HB0471 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds William R. Moore College of Technology as an eligible institution for receipt of dual enrollment grants. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 4, relative to dual enrollment.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 392 | |
2021-05-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-28 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-26 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to Lottery Calendar |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1157 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 392