TN HB0526 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes requirement for receipt of certain grants and loans for water and wastewater treatment infrastructure projects that a municipality includes depreciation in its calculation of fees or rates. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 9; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to utilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-23 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/22/2024 |
2024-04-15 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 4/22/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 4/9/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/6/2024 |
2023-03-15 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/15/2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2023-02-21 | House | Ref. to Local Government Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0129 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 1, PNV 0