TN HB0602 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes prohibition on treasurer signing campaign finance disclosure statements as a witness. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 3.
Title
As introduced, removes prohibition on treasurer signing campaign finance disclosure statements as a witness. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 2016 |
2015-04-01 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0038 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0602&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0602.pdf |