TN HB0648 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates real property tax freeze program for persons 65 years of age or older who have lived in their principal residence for 30 years or more when the assessed value of the property increases by 50 percent or more from an established baseline assessed value of the property. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 7.
Title
As introduced, creates real property tax freeze program for persons 65 years of age or older who have lived in their principal residence for 30 years or more when the assessed value of the property increases by 50 percent or more from an established baseline assessed value of the property. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1090 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee