TN HB0815 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal. in Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal. in Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires certain individual and group health insurance policies to provide coverage of a continuous glucose monitor for a person with diabetes who is insulin-dependent and is covered by the policy. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71, relative to health insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Insurance Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0755 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-14 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to first calendar of 2024