TN HB0836 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Pub. Ch. 514
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Pub. Ch. 514
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits, to the extent allowed by federal law, a private licensed child-placing agency from being required to perform, assist, consent to, refer, or participate in any child placement for foster care or adoption that would violate the agency's written religious or moral convictions. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, prohibits, to the extent allowed by federal law, a private licensed child-placing agency from being required to perform, assist, consent to, refer, or participate in any child placement for foster care or adoption that would violate the agency's written religious or moral convictions. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
Rep. Curtis Johnson [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Pub. Ch. 514 | |
2020-02-18 | Effective date(s) 01/24/2020 | |
2020-01-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-01-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-01-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-01-15 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 20, Nays 6 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Amendment tabled (Amendment 2 - SA0466) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0402) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-02 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 67, Nays 22, PNV 3 |
2019-04-01 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0123) |
2019-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary-- Government Operations for Review |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1304 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 514