TN HB0841 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes it a Class E felony for a book publisher, distributor, or seller to knowingly sell or distribute obscene matter to a public school serving any of the grades K-12; adds additional fines for a violation. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 9.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 9, relative to obscenity.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Jody Barrett [R] | Rep. Jake McCalmon [R] | Rep. Monty Fritts [R] |
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 278 | |
2023-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2023 |
2023-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-06 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2023-03-30 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/6/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2023 |
2023-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1059 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-04 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023