TN HB0843 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from September 15 to October 1, the date by which each public institution of higher education operating a hearing center must provide a written report to the Tennessee higher education commission, the education committee of the senate, and the education administration committee of the house of representatives regarding the operation of the hearing center. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Jody Barrett [R] | Rep. Jake McCalmon [R] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] |
Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Monty Fritts [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Rep. Ed Butler [R] | Rep. Robert Stevens [R] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] |
Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS 1 & 2 (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-04-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-05 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-04 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 & 2 Ayes 76, Nays 18 PNV 0 HB0843 |
2024-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Adopted as amended, Ayes 24, Nays 5 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0736) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Motion to lift from the table adopted |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-25 | House | H. returned to Senate |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Recalled from House |
2024-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | Reset on cal. for Next Available Message Calendar |
2024-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-18 | House | Reset on cal. for Next Available Message Calendar |
2024-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 24, Nays 4, PNV 1 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0586) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-04-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-04-17 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 71, Nays 22, PNV 0 |
2023-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-17 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0318) |
2023-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2023 |
2023-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-06 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2023-03-30 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/6/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2023-03-15 | House | Ref. to Education Administration |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1060 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-08 - Sponsor(s) Added.